Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Savastano

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1711BornNapoli
5 Mar 173523.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 175947.4SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
28 May 175947.6ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
4 Jun 175947.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
6 Sep 176957.8DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Savastano:
Bishop Ignazio Savastano (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015