Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Orsi

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1716BornBologna
23 May 173923.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 176448.9AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
30 Dec 176448.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
26 Dec 177458.9DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Orsi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Orsi (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015