Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anzelmo (Nicolò) Katić (Cattich), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1715Born
18 Jun 173721.5ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
7 Feb 174024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
15 Dec 176045.0AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
28 Dec 176045.0Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
24 Jan 179276.1DiedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Anzelmo (Nicolò) Katić (Cattich) (VIAF: 305600749)
Bishop Anzelmo (Nicolò) Katić (Cattich) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubrovnik, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aracoeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCepikucje, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Church, Slano, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 37
  • ob/c2+: AT, 15 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,569

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast