Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio (Felix Antonius Paschalis) Boari, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1745BornMarrara
27 Aug 176924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jul 179751.9AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
30 Jul 179751.9Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
24 Nov 181772.3DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio (Felix Antonius Paschalis) Boari
Bishop Gregorio (Felix Antonius Paschalis) Boari O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1807
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 174
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016