Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelicus (Bartholomaeus) Benincasa, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Camerino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1728BornSassuolo
18 Dec 175123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Jun 179667.6AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
10 Jul 179667.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
17 May 181586.4DiedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelicus (Bartholomaeus) Benincasa:
Archbishop Angelicus (Bartholomaeus) Benincasa O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Camerino

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013