Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Mami

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1711Born
24 Sep 173523.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 176048.3AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
26 May 176048.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
21 Mar 178775.2DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Mami
Bishop Giovanni Battista Mami (born , died ) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMercato Saraceno

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 369
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast