Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Tommasini

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1753³BornDiminniti
19 Dec 177825.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179238.9SelectedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
26 Mar 179239.1ConfirmedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
10 Apr 179239.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
20 Mar 181865.1SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
25 May 181865.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
18 Sep 182673.6DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Tommasini
Archbishop Alessandro Tommasini (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 321
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016