Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Simone Assemani

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1687Born
21 Sep 171023.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 176679.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
7 Dec 176679.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
13 Jan 176880.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Simone Assemani (VIAF: 9927564)
Archbishop Giuseppe Simone Assemani (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Tyrus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHasroun, Mount Lebanon, Lebanon

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 423
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast