Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Ferdinando Sanseverino, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1723BornMaratea in Basilicata
17 Dec 174623.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Pious Workers
18 Mar 174724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
29 Jan 177046.9AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
4 Feb 177046.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
21 Mar 177653.1SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Apr 177653.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Apr 177653.1AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
31 Mar 179370.1DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ferdinando Sanseverino:
Archbishop Francesco Ferdinando Sanseverino C.P.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 77, and Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013