Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Santucci

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1698BornCossignano
22 Nov 175860.5AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
30 Nov 175860.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
4 Jun 176365.0DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Santucci:
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Santucci (born , died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013