Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corrado Maria Deodato de Moncada

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1736³BornNoto
1 Mar 176024.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 177337.2SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
10 May 177337.3ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
16 May 177337.3Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
23 Oct 181377.7DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Corrado Maria Deodato de Moncada:
Bishop Corrado Maria Deodato de Moncada (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015