Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Amadei

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1721Born
28 Oct 176241.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 176241.5AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
30 Nov 176241.5Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
9 Aug 177554.2DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Amadei
Bishop Filippo Amadei (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 12.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast