Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Maria de Tarsia, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1709BornCosenza
4 Apr 173324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
12 Mar 177061.0AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
19 Mar 177061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
1782¹72.8DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Maria de Tarsia:
Bishop Giacomo Maria de Tarsia O.M. (born , died 1782) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015