Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dionisio Ridolfini Conestabile

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1761³BornNarni
23 Dec 178625.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 180241.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
15 Aug 180241.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
26 Sep 180342.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
17 Dec 180645.3DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Ridolfini Conestabile:
Archbishop Dionisio Ridolfini Conestabile (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 164, and Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013