Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josť Maria Sisto e Brito, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1718BornCeglio Feudo di fua Cafa
Oct 174022.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 176850.0AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
25 Mar 176850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
179677.8DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

MicroData Summary for Josť Maria Sisto e Brito:
Bishop Josť Maria Sisto e Brito C.R. (born ) Bishop of Sora

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013