Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Maria Collet, S.J. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Adrasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1730BornBrest, France
31 Jul 175121.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
15 Feb 176130.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Apr 176635.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
20 Apr 176635.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
11 Sep 177242.2DiedTitular Bishop of Adrasus

MicroData Summary for François Maria Collet:
Bishop François Maria Collet S.J. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Adrasus

  • a priest for 11.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015