Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Bizarri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1723BornSan Angelo in Vado
21 Dec 174724.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 174724.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 176946.6AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
30 Nov 176946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
13 Jul 177653.2ResignedBishop of Forli, Italy
1785¹61.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Bizarri:
Bishop Nicola Bizarri (born , died 1785) Bishop Emeritus of Forli

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 218
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015