Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo Gennaro Testa Piccolomini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria

Titular Archbishop of Cartagine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1708BornNapoli
2 Apr 174031.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 176152.4SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
6 Apr 176152.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
12 Apr 176152.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
21 Nov 176658.1ResignedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
22 Dec 176658.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
6 Apr 178273.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Gennaro Testa Piccolomini:
Archbishop Matteo Gennaro Testa Piccolomini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150, and Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Nov 2015