Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Gorgoni

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1712BornGalatina
5 Mar 173523.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 177057.9AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
4 Feb 177057.9Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
1790¹77.8DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Gorgoni:
Bishop Agostino Gorgoni (born , died 1790) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015