Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Spiridione Berioli

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1733Born
4 Jun 175724.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 178754.6AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
30 Dec 178754.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
19 Apr 181986.0DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Spiridione Berioli
Archbishop Spiridione Berioli (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCitta di Castello

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1790
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast