Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas (Angelo Odardo) Stefanini

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1710BornBastia
19 Dec 173323.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 177059.8AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
12 Aug 177059.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
31 Jul 177261.8ResignedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
7 Sep 177261.9AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
29 Jan 177564.3DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas (Angelo Odardo) Stefanini:
Bishop Nicolas (Angelo Odardo) Stefanini (born , died ) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013