Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-André-François de Paule de Fallot de Béaupré de Beaumont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vaison, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1750Born
18 Sep 177323.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 178232.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vaison, France
16 Dec 178232.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
21 Dec 178232.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
19 Nov 178636.6SucceededBishop of Vaison, France
18 Nov 180151.6ResignedBishop of Vaison, France
11 Apr 180252.0SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
15 May 180252.1ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
3 Aug 180757.3AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
181160.7SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
8 Apr 181767.0ResignedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
27 Oct 183585.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Vaison, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Etienne-André-François de Paule de Fallot de Béaupré de Beaumont
Bishop Etienne-André-François de Paule de Fallot de Béaupré de Beaumont (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vaison

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 52.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1807
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202, and Page 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 371, and Page 433

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018