Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Marchese

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1746BornCamerota
4 Apr 177225.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179245.5SelectedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
26 Mar 179245.6ConfirmedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
10 Apr 179245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
22 Dec 180256.4DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Marchese
Bishop Giovanni Battista Marchese (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016