Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola

Archidioecesis Mutinensis-Nonantulanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antonio Lanfranchi, Archbishop
  • Benito Cocchi, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Modena
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Modena (erected)
Diocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
15 December 1820UnitedDiocese of Modena
Territorial Abbey of Nonantola
Diocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
22 August 1855ElevatedDiocese of Modena (e Nonantola) Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola) Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
1950383,519383,76999.9%35286438875105935225ap1951
1970404,500405,00099.9%32099419965132700238ap1971
1980405,000420,00096.4%2711133841,054131770244ap1981
Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola
1990420,000430,00097.7%245883331,26116100610246ap1991
1999443,200444,50099.7%220813011,4723794556245ap2000
2000442,500443,80099.7%219742931,5103887561244ap2001
2001443,520445,00099.7%212722841,5613887553244ap2002
2002455,000458,00099.3%197782751,6543791548243ap2003
2003446,300448,50099.5%189732621,7033982538243ap2004
2004455,000462,00098.5%184762601,7504285538246ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014