Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Verucchi

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1937 BornMiceno di Pavullo nel Frignano
29 Jun 196123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
9 Mar 200062.3AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
13 May 200062.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
3 Jun 200062.5InstalledArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
17 Nov 201275.0RetiredArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Verucchi:
Archbishop Giuseppe Verucchi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ravenna-Cervia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,763
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013