Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Scanaroli (Scannaroli)

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornModène
17 Dec 162232.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 163040.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
7 Oct 163040.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
10 Sep 166474.6DiedTitular Bishop of Sidon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Scanaroli (Scannaroli):
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Scanaroli (Scannaroli) (died ) Titular Bishop of Sidon

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015