Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pellegrino Bertacchi

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1567Born
22 Mar 161042.7AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
28 Mar 161042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
22 Aug 162760.2DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino Bertacchi (VIAF: 89649416)
Bishop Pellegrino Bertacchi (born , died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamporgiano
Ordained BishopSanta Maria dell’Anima, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Modena, Diocese of Modena

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 5
  • b/c34: AT, 5 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast