Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Rangoni

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1596AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
3 Dec 1596Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
23 Mar 1597InstalledBishop of Piacenza, Italy
13 Sep 1619DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Rangoni:
Bishop Claudio Rangoni (died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,891
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 281
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013