Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Aldobrandino d’Este

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1325¹Born
19 Mar 134823.2AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
3 May 134924.3Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
18 Jan 135328.0AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
1377¹52.0AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
30 Oct 138156.8DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Aldobrandino d’Este
Bishop Bl. Aldobrandino d’Este (born 1325, died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,665
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 71, and Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Aug 2021

Quantcast