Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benito Cocchi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Modena-Nonantola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1934Born
14 Mar 195924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
12 Dec 197440.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
12 Dec 197440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
6 Jan 197540.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraï
22 May 198247.5AppointedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
12 Apr 199661.4AppointedArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
9 Jun 199661.5InstalledArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
27 Jan 201075.2RetiredArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
5 May 201681.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Modena-Nonantola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benito Cocchi (VIAF: 89591928)
Archbishop Benito Cocchi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Modena-Nonantola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinerbio, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained PriestBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Death PlaceCasa del Clero, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)San Cataldo, Cemetery, Modena, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Modena, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2010
  • d: CB, 5 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 6 May 2018
  • loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast