Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Masetti

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1585AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
13 Oct 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
2 Sep 1592DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Masetti:
Bishop Giulio Masetti (died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013