Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Canani

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524²Born
26 Nov 155430.9AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
30 Dec 155430.9Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
12 Dec 158359.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 158460.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
8 Feb 159167.1AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
20 Mar 159167.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
27 Nov 159268.9DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Canani (VIAF: 187644415)
Giulio Cardinal Canani (born 1524, died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Buried Place (Original)S. Domenico, Church, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
  • a cardinal for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95, and Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast