Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Lanfranchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1946Born
4 Nov 197125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
3 Dec 200357.5AppointedBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
11 Jan 200457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
25 Jan 200457.6InstalledBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
27 Jan 201063.6AppointedArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
14 Mar 201063.8InstalledArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
17 Feb 201568.7DiedArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lanfranchi
Archbishop Antonio Lanfranchi (born , died ) Archbishop of Modena-Nonantola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrondone di Ferriere, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained PriestCathedral, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio
Death PlaceModena, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola
Buried Place (Original)San Cataldo, Cemetery, Modena, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Modena, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,509
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2010
  • d: CB, 17 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • 23.loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast