Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pistoia

Dioecesis Pistoriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Fausto Tardelli, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 25 January 1954
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 821 (317 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Toscana
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesipistoia.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Via Puccini 29, 51100 Pistoia, Italia
  • Telephone: 0573.35.96.10
  • Fax: 0573.35.96.35

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Pistoia
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Pistoia (erected)
Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
22 September 1653Name ChangedDiocese of Pistoia Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
Diocese of Pistoia
25 January 1954SplitDiocese of Pistoia e Prato Diocese of Pistoia
Diocese of Prato
12 July 1972Territory AddedArchdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola) (Part of Piumalbo (in Abetone)) Diocese of Pistoia
7 October 1975Territory LostDiocese of Pistoia (Cantagallo, Cavarzano, Fossato, CrHcigliana, Luicciana, Mercatale, Migliana, Montepiano, San Quirico, S. Ippolito, Sasseta, and Usella) Diocese of Prato

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
1886168,482.0%4740203OTC
1949262,103262,40399.9%2898937869395791217ap1951
Diocese of Pistoia
1970201,919202,23899.8%1884723585967549172ap1971
1980204,221204,96599.6%157361931,058142439160ap1981
1990219,100220,40099.4%142281701,288430349158ap1991
1999212,885213,68599.6%141321731,2302534254160ap2000
2000211,000229,00092.1%130311611,3102433275160ap2001
2001215,000236,11191.1%131291601,3432332240160ap2002
2002221,300234,91294.2%134301641,3492332227160ap2003
2003207,861220,86194.1%135301651,2592332224160ap2004
2004215,000217,51598.8%129271561,3782327227161ap2005
2013219,300228,60095.9%97221191,8422226152160ap2014
2016217,600222,13098.0%90151052,0721917143160ap2017
2019210,900215,23098.0%95101052,0081712131160ap2020
2021204,100208,30098.0%9591041,962169111160ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Pistoia
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 400, and Page 401
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 216
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 750, to Page 751
  • Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 315, and Page 316
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340
  • Diocese of Pistoia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 390, to Page 392
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 645, and Page 646

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 11 Feb 2024