Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Opizio d’Este

Deceased

Bishop of Modena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornModene
19 Nov 164030.8AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
16 Dec 164030.9Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
Aug 1644³34.5DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Opizio d’Este
Bishop Opizio d’Este (born 1610, died Aug 1644) Bishop of Modena

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: AT, 26 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jul 2016