Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ercole Cardinal Rangone

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491¹Born
1 Jul 151726.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151726.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
15 Jun 151928.4AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
12 Sep 152029.6AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
27 May 152433.4ResignedBishop of Adria, Italy
25 Aug 152736.6DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ercole Rangone
Ercole Cardinal Rangone (born 1491, died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 252, and Page 95
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,519, Number 43*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast