Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso De’ Bellincini

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1660³BornModena
16 May 170040.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 171050.2AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
12 Jun 172161.4DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso De’ Bellincini:
Bishop Alfonso De’ Bellincini (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a priest for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015