Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amilcare Cardinal Malagola

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1840Born
19 Dec 186322.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187635.5AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
9 Jul 187635.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
21 Sep 187736.7AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
16 Jan 189352.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189352.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
22 Jun 189554.4DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amilcare Malagola (VIAF: 89294923)
Amilcare Cardinal Malagola (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Death PlaceFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Buried Place (Original)Municipal, Cemetery, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,541
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126, and Page 272
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,876, Number 49
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 306, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 420, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 513, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 615, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 722, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast