Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guglielmo Cardinal di Modena, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1184¹Born
May 1222²38.3AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
21 Sep 123349.7ResignedBishop of Modena, Italy
28 May 124460.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
28 May 124460.4Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 125167.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo di Modena
Guglielmo Cardinal di Modena O. Cart. (born 1184, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiedmont

  • a cardinal for 6.8 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 May 1244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 353
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast