Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Ferrari

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450²Born
11 Sep 149545.6AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
28 Sep 150050.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150050.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
9 Aug 150151.6AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
20 Jul 150252.5DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Ferrari
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Ferrari (born 1450, died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena
Death PlaceVatican Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Patriarchal Vatican, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Modena, Diocese of Modena

  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 198, and Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1495, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast