Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Natale Bruni

Deceased

Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1856BornNociveglia
12 Apr 187922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Aug 187922.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190044.0AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
27 Dec 190044.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
14 Apr 192669.3DiedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Natale Bruni:
Archbishop Natale Bruni (born , died ) Archbishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,236
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,004
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013