Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacopo Cardinal Sadoleto

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1477Born
1511²33.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 151739.7AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
4 Mar 152042.6Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
22 Dec 153659.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153759.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
11 May 154567.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
27 Nov 154568.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
18 Oct 154770.2DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacopo Sadoleto (VIAF: 76326881)
Jacopo Cardinal Sadoleto (born , died ) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceApt. in S. Maria in Trastevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro in Vincoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Carpentras, Diocese of Carpentras

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Aug 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017