Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Molza

Deceased

Bishop of Modena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1688BornModena
22 Nov 172234.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 174354.6AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
2 Jun 174354.6Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
1 Jan 174556.2DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ettore Molza:
Bishop Ettore Molza (born , died ) Bishop of Modena

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013