Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Amici

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1901BornSan Angelo Lodigiano
29 May 192625.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 195150.3AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
15 May 195150.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Foggia, Italy
29 Jun 195150.4Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
1 Feb 195453.0SucceededBishop of Foggia, Italy
1 Feb 195554.0AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
23 Dec 195655.9AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
7 Feb 197675.0RetiredArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
21 Mar 197776.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Amici:
Archbishop Giuseppe Amici (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013