Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guidone de Guisis

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1318AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
16 Sep 1334AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
17 Jun 1347DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Guidone de Guisis
Bishop Guidone de Guisis (died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 201, and Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 22 May 2019

Quantcast