Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone

Dioecesis Concordiensis-Portus Naonis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuseppe Pellegrini, Bishop
  • Ovidio Poletto, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria)
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Concordia (Sagittaria) (erected)
6 July 1751Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Concordia (Sagittaria) (from Aquileia to Udine)
13 November 1923Territory AddedArchdiocese of Udine (Carbona and Methuna) Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria)
10 January 1925Territory LostDiocese of Concordia (Sagittaria) (Riviera Antonio Scarpa) Diocese of Ceneda
20 November 1937Territory AddedArchdiocese of Genova (Sacco and Isola) Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria)
Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone
12 January 1971Name ChangedDiocese of Concordia (Sagittaria) Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone
29 June 2018Territory AddedPatriarchate of Venezia {Venice} (S. Bartolomeo Apostolo (in frazione di Brussa di Caorle) and Regina della Pace (in frazione Castello di Lugugnana)) Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria)
1886184,580.0%2690123OTC
1950316,820316,858100.0%292173091,0251049174ap1951
1970301,188.0%348604080109756192ap1971
Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone
1980320,000321,03599.7%3165937585391603204ap1981
1990332,791334,12999.6%29457351948271422188ap1991
1999337,204339,32299.4%283613449801573307188ap2000
2000337,604339,88099.3%273653389981687292188ap2001
2001338,528341,09399.2%275693449841795268188ap2002
2002339,422342,34099.1%268673351,01316104282188ap2003
2003339,118342,71199.0%276673439881692261188ap2004
2004341,687346,17798.7%270633331,0261674254188ap2005
2006345,361350,10298.6%265563211,0751773245188ap2007
2013359,517368,48397.6%252432951,2181954214188ap2014
2016364,138374,67097.2%243482911,2511863201188ap2017
2019365,199377,02796.9%222392611,3992151161190ap2020
2021346,759376,10992.2%210332431,4262244161190ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 201
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 133
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 174
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 178
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 788, to Page 789
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 16, Page 465
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 19, Page 19, and Page 20
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 63, and Page 64
  • Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 63, Page 241
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 110, Page 1,038

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024