Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Pizzi

Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1942 Born
18 Jun 196623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
12 Nov 200563.1AppointedBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
22 Jan 200663.3Ordained BishopBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
29 Jan 200663.3InstalledBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
23 Jan 201875.3RetiredBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lino Pizzi
Bishop Lino Pizzi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRivara, Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
Ordained BishopBasilica, Co-Cathedral, Nonantola, Archdiocese of Modena-Nonantola

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Forli-Bertinoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,042
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2018
  • c1: AM, 6 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast