Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abele Conigli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teramo-Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1913Born
24 Aug 193522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
2 May 196350.2AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
9 Jun 196350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
15 Jun 196350.4InstalledBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
16 Feb 196754.0AppointedBishop of Teramo e Atri, Italy
31 Dec 198875.9RetiredBishop of Teramo-Atri, Italy
14 Mar 200592.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Teramo-Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Abele Conigli (VIAF: 316745474)
Bishop Abele Conigli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teramo-Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito di Spilamberto, Archdiocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
Death PlaceScapriano, Diocese of Teramo-Atri

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • i/loc: AM, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast