Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1792BornModena
20 May 181522.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 184855.7AppointedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
17 Sep 184855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
19 Apr 185158.5DiedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ferrari:
Bishop Luigi Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013