Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Reggianini

Deceased

Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1775BornModena
21 Dec 179924.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 183862.6AppointedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
25 Mar 183862.7Ordained BishopBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
9 Jan 184771.5DiedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Reggianini:
Bishop Luigi Reggianini (born , died ) Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013